+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 175)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 3rd reading, passed 36-0 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Health & Welfare (S) 2nd reading returned to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Health & Welfare (S) 1st reading returned to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor