+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 75-25
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor