+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 238)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 14, 2022 3rd reading floor amendments (2) and (1-title) withdrawn passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) passed 71-15 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 85-2
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor