+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Education (H) 1st reading returned to Education (H)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- to Education (H)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)