+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 171)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor