+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 150)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-3
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Transportation
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 75-6 with floor amendment (1)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 12, 2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Floor amendments (1) and (2) filed
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- To Transportation
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HFA1
Provide that an applicant may submit a medical practitioner's excuse for a missed test without giving 48 hour's notice; specify that a missed exam shall not result in forfeiture of fees if a medical excuse is presented; make technical corrections to comply with federal regulations.
HFA2
Provide that an applicant may submit a medical practitioner's excuse for a missed test without giving 48 hour's notice; specify that a missed exam shall not result in forfeiture of fees if a medical excuse is presented; make technical corrections to comply with federal regulations.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor