+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)