+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 167)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto overridden Bill passed 51-42 received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto overridden Bill passed 23-14 received in House
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 floor amendments (7) and (8) filed to Committee Substitute 3rd reading floor amendments (2), (3), (4), (5), and (6) ruled not germane passed 21-15 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules (H) posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) passed 48-47 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) floor amendment (1) withdrawn floor amendment (4), (5), and (6) filed
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S) to Appropriations & Revenue (S) taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) floor amendments (1), (2), and (3) filed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) taken from Rules (H) placed in the Orders of the Day floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), (7), (8), (9), (10), (11), (12), (13), (14), (15), (16), (17), (18), (19), and (20) filed to Committee Substitute 3rd reading floor amendments (2), (5), (7), and (10) defeated passed 51-45 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1), (14), (20), and committee amendment (1-title)
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- to Education (H)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor