+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 63-0 received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 31, 2022
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- to State Government (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On August 30, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor