+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78)
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023 3rd reading, passed 36 -0 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) passed 98-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- taken from Health Services (S) 2nd reading returned to Health Services (S)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- taken from Committee on Committees (S) 1st reading returned to Committee on Committees (S) to Health Services (S)
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) taken from Rules placed in the Orders of the Day 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- taken from Health Services (H) 2nd reading returned to Health Services (H)
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- taken from Health Services (H) 1st reading returned to Health Services (H)
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- to Health Services (H)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)