+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Education
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- To Education
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House