+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 11)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-1
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S) to Health & Welfare (S)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- to Health and Family Services (H)
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).