+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 197)
On April 14, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On April 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 13, 2018
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 87-0
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- To Judiciary
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House