+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Committee on Committees
- 1st reading
- Taken from Committee on Committees
- Received in Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Floor amendment (2) filed
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HFA2
Create a new section of KRS 205.510 to 205.630 to define “fair market value,” when considered for Medicaid eligibility, to mean an estimate of the value of an asset if sold at the prevailing price at the time it was actually transferred, or the price brought on the property at a public auction conducted by a licensed auctioneer; delete KRS 330.050 and KRS 330.192.
HFA1
Delete KRS 139.496, which deals with sales tax and charitable auctions.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor