+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- taken from Health & Welfare (S) 2nd reading returned to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- taken from Health & Welfare (S) 1st reading returned to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House