+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 59-32 with committee amendment (1)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 29
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Posting waived
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On September 15, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Amendment
HCA1
Delete provision relating to duties of directors of other types of corporations.