+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 85-2 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2), and committee amendment (1-title)
- Floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On October 13, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Amendments (4)
HFA2
Add non-inclusive list of types of contact with Kentucky which would allow a court to exercise jurisdiction.
HFA1
Add non-inclusive list of types of contact with Kentucky which would allow a court to exercise jurisdiction.
HCA1
Make title amendment.
HCS1
Retain original provisions; amend KRS 454.210 to allow service of process on nonresidents to be made in any manner authorized by the Kentucky Rules of Civil Procedure, including certified mail with return receipt requested.