+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 100)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-0
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2022
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- to State Government (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On August 11, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor