+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- floor amendments (1) and (2) filed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)