+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 86-11 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2022
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- to Local Government (H)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor