+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Delivered to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 31-7
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 20, 2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 65-30
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 10, 2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- To Licensing & Occupations (H)
- Posted in committee
- Posting waived
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor