+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-1-1
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SFA (1/Title, J. Higdon)
Make title amendment.
SFA (2, J. Higdon)
Amend KRS 278.502 to exclude natural gas liquids from the definition of oil or gas or oil and gas products as used in that statute; include transitional provision making the bill's provision retroactive to cover any eminent domain action filed under KRS 278.502; declare an EMERGENCY.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor