+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 133)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Bill passed 79-10
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- To Rules
- Received in House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 33-5 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a consent bill
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
- Returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
- 1st reading
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 81-15 with Committee Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 2, 2017
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Economic Development & Workforce Investment
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SCS1
Retain original provisions, except remove the word "senior" from pervasive management to compy with federal review.
HCS1
Retain original provisions except to renumber paragraph (a) and (b) of subsection 7 of Section 1, then renumber the subsections accordingly; amend Section 3, KRS 341.540 to include the opportunity for a nonsubject successor employer to make a one-time voluntary payment within 60 days of a negative predecessor reserve account.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor