+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 83-1 received in Senate to Judiciary (S)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- returned to Rules
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House