+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed in Senate
- Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
- Received in Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- To Rules (H)
- Received in House
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
- To State & Local Government (S)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with floor amendment (1)
- Floor amendment (2) filed
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Posting waived
- To State Government (H)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (4)
SCS
Retain original provisions except delete all provision relating to the legislative compensation portion of the study; amend to stagger appointments to the Kentucky Citizen's Commission on Judicial Compensation; prohibit members appointed to the commission from making contributions to political campaigns.
SCA (1/Title, J. Bowen)
Make title amendment.
HFA (2, J. Hoover)
Amend to stagger appointments to the Kentucky Citizens' Commission on Judicial and Legislative Compensation; prohibit members appointed to the commission from making contributions to political campaigns within the four years preceding their appointment.
HFA (1, B. Yonts)
Amend to remove the mandatory requirement that commission findings be reflected in branch budget recommendations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor