+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-4 with floor amendment (1)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
- Taken from Rules
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- To Tourism Development & Energy (H)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HFA (1, K. Hall)
Retain original provisions, designate one cent per gallon from tax on natural gas motor fuels to be paid to alternative fuel and renewable energy fund, and four-tenths of one cent to the financial responsibility account.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor