+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- reassigned to Education (H)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House