+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 91-1 with Committee Substitutes (1) floor amendment (1)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- To Banking & Insurance
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HFA1
Amend original provisions to refer to "contract retail pharmacy"; clarify language relating to terms and condition requirements for participation; amend to prohibit an insurer which has a specialty drug network from discriminating against a contract pharmacy filling a specialty drug prescription if it meets the terms and conditions of the provider contract.
HCS1/HM
Amend original provisions to remove reference to specialty drugs clarify when health benefit plans are required to begin compliance; add requirement that health benefit plans offering specialty drug coverage set up a specialty drug network; prohibit the insurer from discriminating against any pharmacy willing to meet the terms of the provider contract; effective January 1, 2017.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor