+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- To Education (H)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor