+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government
- Received in Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 69-17 with Committee Substitute
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- To State Government
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Restore the time a crime victim may file a claim from 2 to 5 years.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor