+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS/LM
Retain original provisions but delay effective date of Act until January 1, 2015; allow Transportation Cabinet to delay production and distribution of Gold Star Siblings license plates for no more than one year past effective date to allow time for the motor vehicle information system to become operational.