+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- taken from Committee on Committees (S) 2nd reading returned to Committee on Committees (S) to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- received in Senate taken from Committee on Committees (S) 1st reading returned to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 12, 2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House