+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor