+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 143)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Delivered to Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-3
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Health & Welfare
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Health & Welfare
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from Health & Welfare
- Returned to Health & Welfare
- 1st reading
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 61-32
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- To Health and Family Services
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor