+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture (S)
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-4 with committee amendment (1)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1)
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Posting waived
- Posted in committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business (H)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCA (1, T. McKee)
Require the Kentucky Board of Agriculture to meet at least four times each year.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor