+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 100)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 28, 2014
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 17, 2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS
Retain original provisions, except amend the definitions for damages and routine road maintenance; make technical changes to amending KRS 367.4909; clarify that an operator may also reject a design information request if the information will place the operator at a competitive disadvantage.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor