+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Education (S)
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Education (S)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Education (S)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Education (S)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 82-8
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- To Education (H)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor