+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 84-3
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- To Judiciary
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor