+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto overridden Bill passed 71-23 received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto overridden Bill passed 33-5 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 161)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-1 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) 1st reading returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 75-21 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)