+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-2
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 7, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor