+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 2nd reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 1st reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute floor amendment (1) withdrawn
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House