+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Judiciary
- 1st reading
- Taken from Judiciary
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 8, 2016
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- Reassigned to Health & Welfare
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- To Judiciary
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to require unannounced visits to the residence or location where the reported child abuse or neglect of a child occurred when an investigation is required; require ongoing unannounced visits to the residence or location where the reported child abuse or neglect of a child occurred until the welfare of a child has been safeguarded; provide that this Section may be cited as the Tucker Act.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor