+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts ch. 18)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 19, 2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 26, 2014
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- To Natural Resources & Environment (H)
- Posted in committee
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor