+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 37)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 6, 2014
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- To Labor & Industry (H)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor