+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 82-7 with Committee Substitute
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Posting waived
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- To Banking & Insurance (H)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS/HM
Amend the definition of "prosthetic" to mean an artificial arm or leg; delete sections created in Subtitles 18 and 32 of KRS Chapter 304; require that coverage for prosthetics be subject to utilization review and internal appeals established by KRS 304.17A-600 to KRS 304.17A-633 for health benefit plans and HMOs, and require HMOs to also comply with KRS 304.38-225 with respect to utilization review; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2014.