+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Recommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1/LM
Retain original provisions and add that the qualifying disability for exemption eligibility must be permanent, amend ballot language to conform with the change.