+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 98)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-1
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources & Energy
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- To Natural Resources & Energy
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House