+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 48)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0-1
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Banking & Insurance (S)
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- to Banking & Insurance (H)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor