+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.149)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) 1st reading returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a Consent bill posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- taken from Local Government (H) 1st reading returned to Local Government (H)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- to Local Government (H)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House