+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 69)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- taken from Rules posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) passed 90-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Transportation (S) 1st reading returned to Transportation (S)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Transportation (S)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- to Transportation (H) posted in committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)